Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Migliavacca (Milliavacca), O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1635Born
22 Sep 165722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
15 Jun 165822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
8 Jun 169357.8AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
14 Jun 169357.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Feb 171478.5DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Migliavacca (Milliavacca)
Bishop Innocenzo Migliavacca (Milliavacca) O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast