Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Lombardi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1766³Born
18 Dec 179024.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 182154.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
2 Sep 182154.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Lombardi
Bishop Domenico Lombardi (born ) Titular Bishop of Lares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorra, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast