Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Adán Méndez Bracamonte

Bishop of Venezuela, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1962 Born
26 Jul 199027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
8 Jun 201552.5AppointedBishop of Venezuela, Military
10 Jul 201552.6Ordained BishopBishop of Venezuela, Military

MicroData Summary for Benito Adán Méndez Bracamonte
Bishop Benito Adán Méndez Bracamonte (born ) Bishop of Venezuela, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMene Grande

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Venezuela, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 16 Jun 2015
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,543

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast