Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Mercader y Arroyo

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1823BornBarcelona
18 Dec 184724.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 187551.6SelectedBishop of Menorca, Spain
17 Sep 187551.8ConfirmedBishop of Menorca, Spain
30 Nov 187552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
21 Feb 189066.2DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Mercader y Arroyo:
Bishop Manuel Mercader y Arroyo (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 43, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015