Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Manríquez y Zárate

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Huejutla, Hidalgo

Titular Bishop of Verbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1884BornLeón
28 Oct 190722.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 192238.0AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
4 Feb 192338.2Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
8 Jul 192338.6InstalledBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
1 Jul 193954.6ResignedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
1 Jul 193954.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Verbe
28 Jun 195166.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Manríquez y Zárate:
Bishop José de Jesús Manríquez y Zárate (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Huejutla

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015