Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Wincenty Stanislaw Mathy (Matthy)

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1765BornKobierzyn
22 Dec 178722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
15 Aug 180338.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Sep 180944.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
8 Mar 182256.9SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
17 Nov 182358.6ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
6 Jun 182459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 May 183267.1DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Wincenty Stanislaw Mathy (Matthy)
Bishop Ignacy Wincenty Stanislaw Mathy (Matthy) (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 169
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,375
  • ob: CB, 3 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016