Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Andreas Riggio

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1660Born
15 Jan 168524.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 169332.9AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
15 Mar 169333.0Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
13 Jan 171655.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
15 Dec 171757.7DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andreas Riggio
Patriarch Andreas Riggio (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150, and Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,693, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast