Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Heinrich von Braitenbücher

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1676³BornWien
1 Aug 169923.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien, Austria
5 Aug 169923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wien, Austria
12 Apr 172851.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
12 Apr 172851.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
16 May 172852.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
24 Feb 174972.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Heinrich von Braitenbücher:
Bishop Joseph Heinrich von Braitenbücher (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015