Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Marsili, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of SapŽ, Albania

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1823Born
6 Jun 184117.8ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
30 Mar 184622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
11 Nov 187350.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of SapŽ, Albania
11 Nov 187350.3SucceededBishop of SapŽ, Albania
11 Nov 187350.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
4 Jan 187450.4Ordained BishopBishop of SapŽ, Albania
11 May 189066.8ResignedBishop of SapŽ, Albania
12 Aug 189067.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
28 Jul 191188.0DiedBishop Emeritus of SapŽ, Albania

MicroData Summary for Giulio Marsili
Bishop Giulio Marsili O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of SapŽ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreccio, Diocese of Rieti, Italy
Ordained BishopShkodrŽ, Diocese of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 560
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 58
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1874, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast