Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Filonardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1624AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
6 Oct 1624Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
15 Mar 1635AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
19 Aug 1644DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Mario Filonardi:
Archbishop Mario Filonardi (died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 86, Number 512
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015