Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Benedetto de Sio, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1585³BornCava
8 Dec 162338.1AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
31 Dec 162338.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
21 Oct 164156.0AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
16 Aug 1651³65.8DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Benedetto de Sio:
Bishop Filippo Benedetto de Sio O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 127, and Page 117
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 82, Number 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013