Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Djordje Marčić

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1815Born
19 Dec 184025.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 186852.0SelectedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
22 Jun 186852.5ConfirmedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
10 Jan 186953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
3 Jan 187963.0DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Djordje Marčić
Bishop Djordje Marčić (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKorčula
Ordained BishopSplit, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast