Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Doymus Zeni

Deceased

Bishop of Arbe (Rab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1662³BornHvar
20 Dec 168725.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 172058.0AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
21 May 172058.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
Mar 1728³65.9DiedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Doymus Zeni:
Bishop Doymus Zeni (born , died Mar 1728) Bishop of Arbe (Rab)

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015