Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Maria Tenderini

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1668BornCarrara
24 May 169829.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Nov 169830.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 171850.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
11 Dec 171850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
1 Mar 173970.3DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Maria Tenderini:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Maria Tenderini (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015