Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Muzio de’ Vecchi

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1669³Born
22 Nov 171647.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 171949.5AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
23 Apr 171949.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
25 Aug 172454.9DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Muzio de’ Vecchi
Bishop Muzio de’ Vecchi (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulmona

  • a priest for 7.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast