Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Etienne-Hubert Cardinal de Cambacérès

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1756BornMontpellier
178023.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 180245.5SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
10 Apr 180245.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
11 Apr 180245.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
17 Jan 180346.3Elevated to Cardinal
1 Feb 180548.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
25 Oct 181862.1DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Hubert de Cambacérès:
Etienne-Hubert Cardinal de Cambacérès (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015