Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Canaves, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1640³BornPollensa, Spain
17 Dec 167838.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
24 Feb 167939.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
30 Aug 171373.6AppointedBishop of Malta
10 Sep 171373.6Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
4 Oct 171373.7InstalledBishop of Malta
3 Jun 172181.4DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Canaves:
Bishop Joaquín Canaves O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 29, Number 73
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015