Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gyözö Simon Macalik

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1890BornSibiu
15 Jul 191626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Innsbruck, Austria
1951²60.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
1951²60.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
19 Aug 195363.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gyözö Simon Macalik:
Bishop Gyözö Simon Macalik (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,007
  • b: CB, 26 Jan 2012
  • name: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013