Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Wojciech von Łubieński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1734Born
29 Sep 175925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
29 Nov 179056.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
29 Nov 179056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
27 Feb 179157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
21 May 180874.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Wojciech von Łubieński
Bishop Stefan Wojciech von Łubieński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwanowice

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast