Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Mateusz Kosmowski, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1725BornSlowikowo
1752¹26.2Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
26 Sep 179165.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Sep 179165.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
6 Nov 179166.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
11 Oct 180479.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michal Mateusz Kosmowski
Bishop Michal Mateusz Kosmowski C.R.L. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,769
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016