Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Maria Bassetti

Deceased

Bishop of Carpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1772BornParma
19 Sep 179522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Parma, Italy
18 Jul 183057.6SelectedBishop of Carpi, Italy
28 Feb 183158.2ConfirmedBishop of Carpi, Italy
19 Jun 183158.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
13 May 183966.4DiedBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Maria Bassetti
Bishop Clemente Maria Bassetti (born , died ) Bishop of Carpi

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,225
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016