Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Loschi

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1759BornSalsomaggiore
21 Sep 178222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
3 May 182464.5AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
9 May 182464.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
14 Jun 183676.6DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Loschi
Bishop Lodovico Loschi (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016