Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro de Marchi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Smirne, Turkey


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1611AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
2 Jun 1611Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
19 Feb 1625AppointedArchbishop of Smirne, Turkey
13 Jul 1648DiedArchbishop of Smirne, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Marchi
Archbishop Pietro de Marchi O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Smirne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece
Ordained BishopAldobrandini Chapel, Santa Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 304, and Page 319
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 44
  • ob/c2+: AT, 6 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast