Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Louis de Lichtervelde

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1718BornGant
9 Mar 174324.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 177960.8SelectedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
20 Mar 178061.5ConfirmedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
9 Apr 178061.6Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
18 Oct 179678.1DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Albert Louis de Lichtervelde:
Bishop Albert Louis de Lichtervelde (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015