Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Peter Paul Li Pan-shi] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1911Born
26 Jul 194433.1Ordained PriestPriest
1981²69.5SelectedBishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China
27 Sep 198170.2Ordained BishopBishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China
4 Jan 200795.5DiedBishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Paul Li Pan-shi
Bishop Peter Paul Li Pan-shi (born , died ) Bishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuangdong
Ordained BishopCathedral, Canton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
Death PlaceZhonghsan

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,092
  • b/op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast