Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Leyburn

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of England (and Wales)

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615²BornCunswick Hall, Beetham, Westmorlands
1646²31.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 168570.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain
24 Aug 168570.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
9 Sep 168570.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
30 Jan 168873.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
20 Jun 170287.4DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Leyburn
Bishop John Leyburn (born 1615, died ) Vicar Apostolic of England (and Wales)

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 139
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 13
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • bp/c1: CB, 20 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016