Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Smith

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645²BornStoke Charity, Winchester
25 Nov 168742.8SelectedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 168843.0ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 168843.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
13 May 168843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
13 May 171166.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Smith:
Bishop James Smith (born 1645, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,408
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137, and Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015