Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Xavier de Cerveira e Sousa

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1797Born
20 Dec 182326.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 184345.6SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
22 Jan 184446.1ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
2 Jun 184446.5Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
8 Jul 184446.6InstalledBishop of Funchal, Portugal
28 May 184951.5SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
28 Sep 184951.8ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
3 Mar 185961.2SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
15 Apr 185961.3ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
15 Mar 186264.3DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Xavier de Cerveira e Sousa
Bishop José Xavier de Cerveira e Sousa (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogofores

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 143, and Page 593
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast