Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Lázaro Martinez, Sch. P.

Bishop Emeritus of Ponce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1936 BornLogrońo, Spain
9 Apr 196125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
20 Mar 200266.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
25 Apr 200266.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
11 Jun 200367.2SucceededBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
22 Dec 201579.8RetiredBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Félix Lázaro Martinez:
Bishop Félix Lázaro Martinez Sch. P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ponce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,179
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 22 Dec 2015