Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Onésime-Quirin Laurans

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1842BornMende
23 Dec 186523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mende, France
13 Jul 190663.9AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
12 Aug 190663.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
15 Jul 191168.9DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Onésime-Quirin Laurans:
Bishop Victor-Onésime-Quirin Laurans (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013