Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Laterza

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1784BornCassano
16 Apr 180824.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 185369.1SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
27 Jun 185369.3ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
3 Jul 185369.3Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
11 Feb 186075.9DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Laterza:
Bishop Luigi Laterza (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013