Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Lasne, C.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin

Titular Bishop of Olba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1868BornNeuville-en-Avesnois, France
30 May 189628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Feb 191143.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale}, Madagascar
15 Feb 191143.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
9 Jul 191143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
23 Jun 192759.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Lasne:
Bishop Charles-François Lasne C.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013