Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Cesare Gandolfi

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1711BornRicaldone
30 Aug 173927.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Sep 173927.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 174836.4SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Apr 174836.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
28 Apr 174836.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
Jun 1758³46.6DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Gandolfi:
Archbishop Giulio Cesare Gandolfi (born , died Jun 1758) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139
  • ob/c2+: AT, 2 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015