Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Cesare Viancini

Deceased

Bishop of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1726Born
21 Feb 175023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Mar 175023.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 176336.7SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
16 May 176336.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
10 Jul 176336.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
17 Jun 177245.8SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Biella, Italy
7 Sep 177246.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Biella, Italy
1 Oct 177246.1InstalledBishop of Biella, Italy
22 Oct 179670.1DiedBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Viancini
Archbishop Giulio Cesare Viancini (born , died ) Bishop of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavigliano

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 133, and Page 422
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast