Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Stanislaus Kutowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1779BornWentfin
12 Jun 180324.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
19 Jun 180324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Feb 183656.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Feb 183656.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
22 May 183656.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
29 Dec 184869.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Johann Stanislaus Kutowski
Bishop Johann Stanislaus Kutowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,532
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016