Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Korytowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1729³Born
22 Feb 175525.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Apr 175526.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178556.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Sep 178556.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
27 Nov 178556.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
11 Jun 179061.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Korytowski
Bishop Józef Korytowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwierczycen

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast