Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kevork (Georges) Kortikian (Kurdighian)

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1872Born
31 Jan 192855.7AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
28 Feb 192855.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
1 Aug 193361.2DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Kevork (Georges) Kortikian (Kurdighian)
Archbishop Kevork (Georges) Kortikian (Kurdighian) (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopBeyrouth

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,934
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,934
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,928, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast