Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Franciszek Wężyk

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1705³BornOpatow
4 Jun 173328.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Jun 173328.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 175247.3SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
9 Apr 175348.1ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
17 Jun 175348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
23 Jan 176559.9SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Apr 176560.1ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Oct 176661.6DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walenty Franciszek Wężyk:
Bishop Walenty Franciszek Wężyk (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,456
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015