Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Weinhart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618BornInnsbruck
164830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Feb 166345.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Feb 166345.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
8 Apr 166345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
22 Jun 168668.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Weinhart:
Bishop Franz Weinhart (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013