Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephanus Kadà

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636¹BornTransilvania
5 Nov 168953.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
5 Nov 168953.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
2 Feb 169054.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
16 Jan 169660.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Kadà:
Bishop Stephanus Kadà (born 1636, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105, and Page 385
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015