Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Carrillo Mayoral

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1746BornPalencia
10 Jul 181569.0AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1 Oct 181569.3Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
19 Mar 182679.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Carrillo Mayoral:
Bishop Antonio Carrillo Mayoral (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 309
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 132, Number 706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015