Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Raymond Hyland, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1837¹BornDublin, Ireland
10 Mar 188245.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
10 Mar 188245.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
30 Apr 188245.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
9 Oct 188447.8DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Raymond Hyland:
Bishop Thomas Raymond Hyland O.P. (died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 266, and Page 466

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013