Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Huang Zi-yu] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1911Born
1938²26.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 198675.0Ordained BishopBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China
8 Apr 199179.4DiedBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Huang Zi-yu
Bishop Joseph Huang Zi-yu (born , died ) Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYangwei
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceYangwei

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast