Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Michael He Jinmin] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1917³Born
3 Dec 194427.3Ordained PriestPriest
1950²32.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
2000²82.4SelectedBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
14 May 200082.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
4 May 200486.7DiedBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael He Jinmin
Bishop Michael He Jinmin (born , died ) Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNingbo, Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]
Death PlaceNingbo, Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast