Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Stephan He Chunming] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1895²Born
21 Jan 196267.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
12 Nov 198691.8DiedBishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephan He Chunming
Bishop Stephan He Chunming (born 1895, died ) Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNantang, Cathedral, Peking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 38
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,082
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast