Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Han Jide, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1940 Born
3 Apr 198544.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Sep 199656.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China
16 Apr 199958.8SucceededBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Han Jide
Bishop Nicholas Han Jide O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Church, Qingyang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pingliang [Pingliang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast