Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto (Johann Theodor) von Senheim, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1601BornKoblenz
161917.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
162422.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Aug 163332.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
8 Aug 163332.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
10 Sep 163433.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
11 Nov 166261.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Otto (Johann Theodor) von Senheim:
Bishop Otto (Johann Theodor) von Senheim O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015