Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Grau y Vallespinos

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1832Born
10 Jun 188653.5AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
26 Sep 188653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Sep 189360.8DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Grau y Vallespinos
Bishop Juan Bautista Grau y Vallespinos (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReus, Archdiocese of Tarragona
Ordained BishopS. Pedro, Reus, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017