Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Salvador Cardinal Casañas y Pagés

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1834Born
18 Dec 185824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
7 Feb 187944.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Urgell, Spain
7 Feb 187944.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
23 Mar 187944.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
22 Sep 187945.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
29 Nov 189561.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 189661.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
18 Apr 190166.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
27 Oct 190874.1DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Casañas y Pagés (VIAF: 56172452)
Salvador Cardinal Casañas y Pagés (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 196
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 576, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017