Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Grande Santos de San Pedro

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627²Born
13 Jan 168154.0AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
May 1681³54.3Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
15 Nov 168356.8AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
15 Oct 169265.7AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
14 Sep 169770.7DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Grande Santos de San Pedro
Bishop Juan Grande Santos de San Pedro (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozo de la Vega

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 221, Number 1,371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast